EP2305376 - Process and catalyst for the catalytic hydrogenation of aromatic and heteroaromatic nitro compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonza Ltd Münchensteinerstrasse 38 4052 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Lonza Ltd. Münchensteinerstrasse 38 4052 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 09012080.9 | 23.09.2009 | [2011/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2305376 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J21/18, B01J23/652, B01J27/185, B01J27/19 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
B01J27/1856 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/6525 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/18 (EP,KR,US);
B01J27/19 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/28 (KR);
C07C209/36 (EP,US);
C07D239/47 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Prozess und Katalysator zur katalytischen Hydrierung von aromatischen und heteroaromatischen Nitroverbindungen | [2011/14] | English: | Process and catalyst for the catalytic hydrogenation of aromatic and heteroaromatic nitro compounds | [2011/14] | French: | Procédé et catalyseur pour l'hydrogénation catalytique de composés de nitro aromatiques et hétéro-aromatiques | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2011/40] | 06.05.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2932620 (VON FUENER WILHELM, et al) [X] 12-14 * column 3, line 35 - line 50; example -; claim - ** page 3, line 38 - line 39; examples 2,3 *; | [I]US4020107 (KOSAK JOHN R) [I] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [I]US4375550 (BIRD ALFRED J [GB], et al) [I] 1-11 * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1533029 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 12-14 * paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0123]; example 1; claim 2 * |