EP2259258 - Recording method of a multilayered optical disk [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/49] | Multilayered optical disk and its recording method | ||
[2012/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Consumer Electronics Co. Ltd. 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2010/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyamoto, Harukazu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Koichi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Nagai, Yutaka c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Nishimura, Koichiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Yasukawa, Takakiyo c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building, 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2012/29] |
Former [2010/49] | 01 /
Miyamoto, Harukazu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Watanabe, Koichi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Nagai, Yutaka c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
Nishimura, Koichiro c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
05 /
Yasukawa, Takakiyo c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2012/29] |
Former [2010/49] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012107.0 | 23.09.2009 | [2010/49] | Priority number, date | JP20090136548 | 05.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009136548 | JP20090159535 | 06.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009159535 | [2010/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2259258 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2259258 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/007, G11B7/125, // G11B7/24 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/1267 (EP,US);
G11B7/24038 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0013 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/49] | G11B7/007, G11B7/125, G11B7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/49] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsverfahren für eine mehrschichtige optische Platte | [2012/05] | English: | Recording method of a multilayered optical disk | [2012/05] | French: | Procédé d'enregistrement pour un disque optique multicouches | [2012/05] |
Former [2010/49] | Mehrschichtige optische Platte und Aufzeichnungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2010/49] | Multilayered optical disk and its recording method | ||
Former [2010/49] | Disque optique multicouches et son procédé d'enregistrement | Examination procedure | 30.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/49] | 20.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2011 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 03.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2011 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11002644.0 / EP2346038 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2009 | AT | 18.07.2012 | BE | 18.07.2012 | CY | 18.07.2012 | CZ | 18.07.2012 | DK | 18.07.2012 | EE | 18.07.2012 | FI | 18.07.2012 | HR | 18.07.2012 | IT | 18.07.2012 | LT | 18.07.2012 | LV | 18.07.2012 | MK | 18.07.2012 | MT | 18.07.2012 | NL | 18.07.2012 | PL | 18.07.2012 | RO | 18.07.2012 | SE | 18.07.2012 | SI | 18.07.2012 | SK | 18.07.2012 | SM | 18.07.2012 | TR | 18.07.2012 | IE | 23.09.2012 | LU | 23.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 18.10.2012 | NO | 18.10.2012 | GR | 19.10.2012 | ES | 29.10.2012 | IS | 18.11.2012 | PT | 19.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 23.09.2009 | |
AT | 18.07.2012 | ||
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
SM | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
LU | 23.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
SM | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
LU | 23.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
MT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
LV | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
HR | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
IS | 18.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
LT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NO | 18.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008101209 (NAGAI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1318509 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0115] * * figure 8 *; | [A]EP2037456 (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0126] * * figures 15, 16 * | Examination | EP2273497 | by applicant | JP2009136548 | JP2009159535 | JPH05101398 | JP2003109217 | JP2005038584 | JP2004327038 | JP2008192258 | US5414451 |