EP2306135 - Graphite plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zehnder Group International AG Moortalstrasse 1 5722 Gränichen / CH | [2014/27] |
Former [2011/14] | For all designated states Zehnder Verkaufs- und Verwaltungs AG Moortalstrasse 1 5722 Gränichen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weschle, Hans-Peter Kreuzstrasse 11/1 77743 Neuried / DE | [2011/14] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/45] | Rausch Wanischeck-Bergmann Brinkmann Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/14] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Intellectual Property Am Seestern 8 40457 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012217.7 | 25.09.2009 | [2011/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2306135 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2306135 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/12, F28F21/02, B32B5/18, B32B27/04, C04B35/536, F24D3/16 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
F28F3/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/04 (EP);
B32B5/18 (EP);
C04B35/536 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
C04B35/82 (EP);
E04C3/20 (EP);
E04C5/07 (EP);
F24D3/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] |
Former [2011/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Grafitplatte | [2011/14] | English: | Graphite plate | [2011/14] | French: | Plaque de graphite | [2011/14] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/19] | 13.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | CY | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 07.11.2018 | |
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6398965 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-3,9 * abstract *; | [X]EP0445400 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-2,7 * column 3, line 1 - line 13 * * column 3, line 42 - line 59 *; | [XI]EP0515891 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-2,6-7 * column 2, line 20 - line 30 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 5 * [I] 3,9-10; | [A]US2003175201 (KLETT JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraph [0043] *; | [XI]DE102008019888 (GRAFTECH INT HOLDINGS INC [US]) [X] 1-2,9 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0061] * [I] 3-5,8 |