EP2223615 - Food grade colouring agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecochroma AG Buckhauserstrasse 19 8045 Zurich / CH | [2011/08] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Rugeris, Jess Edward Alpha, Hursfield Road West Molesey Surrey KT8 1QU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rugeris, Jess Edward Alpha Hursfield Road West Molesey Surrey KT8 1QU / GB | [2011/08] |
Former [2010/35] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 09012445.4 | 01.10.2009 | [2010/35] | Priority number, date | EP20090002501 | 21.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09002501 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2223615 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/275, A23G9/42 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
C09B61/00 (EP,US);
A23G3/0097 (EP,US);
A23G3/36 (EP,US);
A23G3/48 (EP,US);
A23G9/32 (EP,US);
A23G9/42 (EP,US);
A23L2/58 (EP,US);
A23L5/43 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Für Lebensmittel geeignete Färbemittel | [2010/35] | English: | Food grade colouring agent | [2010/35] | French: | Agent de coloration de qualité alimentaire | [2010/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/15] | 28.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 07.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 28.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE1114696 (OETKER AUGUST DR FA) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15; | [A]JPH03215569 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y]US5958481 (HODGES WILLIAM S [US]) [Y] 15 * claim - *; | [Y]WO02087353 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [Y] 15 * example 1 *; | [A]WO03010240 (HANSENS LAB [DK]) [A] 1-15 * example 14 *; | [Y]EP1293539 (SAN EI GEN FFI INC [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] - [0 50]; example - *; | [X]US2003082281 (KOHLER KLAUS [DK], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0037] - [0041]; example -; claim - *; | [X]US2004022904 (NGUYEN ISABELLE [FR]) [X] 1-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0045]; claim - *; | [X]US2006003060 (LAURO GABRIEL J [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [00 8] - [0014] - [0 21] - [0024] *; | [Y]US2007218189 (OKU KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0 25] - [0029]; examples B-2, 13, 15 *; | [A]FR2914311 (DIANA NATURALS SOC PAR ACTIONS [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 8, lines 1-12, 32-34 * |