EP2172401 - Stackable low depth tray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rehrig Pacific Company 4010 East 26th Street Los Angeles, CA 90058 / US | [2010/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Apps, William P. 225 Lake Heights Drive Alpharetta Georgia 30022 / US | [2011/51] |
Former [2010/14] | 01 /
Apps, William P. 225 Lake Heights Drive Alpharetta Georgia 30022 / US | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2010/14] | Chave, Lynne Fiona, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP New Priestgate House 57 Priestgate Peterborough Cambridgeshire PE1 1JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 09012612.9 | 06.10.2009 | [2010/14] | Priority number, date | US20080102965P | 06.10.2008 Original published format: US 102965 P | [2010/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2172401 | Date: | 07.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2172401 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/24, B65D71/70 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
B65D71/70 (EP,US);
B65D1/243 (EP,US);
B65D2501/24019 (EP,US);
B65D2501/2407 (EP,US);
B65D2501/24108 (EP,US);
B65D2501/24127 (EP,US);
B65D2501/24152 (EP,US);
B65D2501/24216 (EP,US);
B65D2501/24235 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/14] | Title | German: | Stapelbares, flaches Tablett | [2010/14] | English: | Stackable low depth tray | [2010/14] | French: | Plateau empilable à faible profondeur | [2010/14] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11194661.2 / EP2433876 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.10.2009 | AT | 21.12.2011 | BE | 21.12.2011 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | DK | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | FI | 21.12.2011 | HR | 21.12.2011 | IT | 21.12.2011 | LT | 21.12.2011 | LV | 21.12.2011 | MK | 21.12.2011 | MT | 21.12.2011 | NL | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | RO | 21.12.2011 | SE | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | SM | 21.12.2011 | TR | 21.12.2011 | BG | 21.03.2012 | NO | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | ES | 01.04.2012 | IS | 21.04.2012 | PT | 23.04.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 06.10.2009 | |
AT | 21.12.2011 | ||
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
SM | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
SM | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
MT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
HR | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 21.12.2011 | |
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
NO | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
NO | 21.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5377862 (OAKES SHAWN A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [XA]US2002148837 (APPS WILLIAM P [US]) [X] 1,8,13 * paragraphs [0042] - [0045]; figure 1 * [A] 14; | [X]US2002195452 (APPS WILLIAM P [US]) [X] 1,8,9,13 * paragraph [0034]; figures 1,8 *; | [PX]WO2009043038 (NORSEMAN PLASTICS LTD [CA], et al) [PX] 1,5,8,11,13 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2107006 (REHRIG PACIFIC CO [US]) [E] 1-5,9,10* the whole document * | by applicant | US5377862 | US2002019542 | US2002148837 | EP2107006 |