EP2174987 - Modified asphalt binders and asphalt paving compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firestone Polymers, LLC 381 West Wilbeth Road Akron, Ohio 44301 / US | For all designated states HERITAGE RESEARCH GROUP 5400 West 86th Street Indianapolis, IN 46268-0213 / US | [2014/09] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Firestone Polymers, LLC 381 West Wilbeth Akron, Ohio 44301 / US | ||
For all designated states HERITAGE RESEARCH GROUP 5400 West 86th Street Indianapolis, IN 46268-0213 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hergenrother, William 195 Dorchester Road Akron, OH 44313 / US | 02 /
Boerner, Peter 9189 Seneca Street N.w. Massillon, OH 44646 / US | 03 /
Rademacher, Christine 714 Hearthstone Circle Akron, OH 44320 / US | 04 /
Reece, Timothy 1511 Iron Liege Road Indianapolis, IN 46217 / US | 05 /
Wissel, Herbert 5210 East 74th Court Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | 06 /
Graves, Daniel 6177 Gartage Ave. N.W., Canal Fulton Ohio 44614 / US | [2014/10] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
Hergenrother, William 195 Dorchester Road Akron, OH 44313 / US | ||
02 /
Boerner, Peter 9189 Seneca Street N.w. Massillon, OH 44646 / US | |||
03 /
Rademacher, Christine 714 Hearthstone Circle Akron, OH 44320 / US | |||
04 /
Reece, Timothy 1511 Iron Liege Road Indianapolis, IN 46217 / US | |||
05 /
Wissel, Herbert 5210 East 74th Court Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | |||
06 /
Graves, Daniel 6177 Gartage Ave. , N.W., Canal Fulton Ohio 44614 / US | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012867.9 | 22.12.2006 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | US20050755666P | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 755666 P | US20050755670P | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 755670 P | US20050755668P | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 755668 P | US20050755667P | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 755667 P | US20060813950P | 15.06.2006 Original published format: US 813950 P | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2174987 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2174987 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08K3/32, C08L53/02 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,KR);
C08K5/5398 (KR);
C08L47/00 (KR);
C08K3/32 (EP);
C08L53/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/74 (EP);
C08L95/00, C08L53/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2010/15] | C08L95/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/15] | Extension states | AL | 14.10.2010 | BA | 14.10.2010 | HR | 14.10.2010 | MK | 14.10.2010 | RS | 14.10.2010 | Title | German: | Modifizierte Asphaltbindemittel und Asphaltstrassenbelagsmassen | [2010/15] | English: | Modified asphalt binders and asphalt paving compositions | [2010/15] | French: | Liants d'asphaltes modifiés et composition de pavage d'asphalte | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06847937.7 / EP1969066 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060847937) is 21.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2006 | CY | 05.03.2014 | CZ | 05.03.2014 | EE | 05.03.2014 | FI | 05.03.2014 | LT | 05.03.2014 | LV | 05.03.2014 | MC | 05.03.2014 | PL | 05.03.2014 | RO | 05.03.2014 | SI | 05.03.2014 | SK | 05.03.2014 | BG | 05.06.2014 | GR | 06.06.2014 | IS | 05.07.2014 | PT | 07.07.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | CY | 05.03.2014 | |
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
GR | 06.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 05.03.2014 | |
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
MC | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 05.03.2014 | |
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SI | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 05.03.2014 | |
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
PT | 07.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 05.03.2014 | |
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
PL | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
SK | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 05.03.2014 | |
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
RO | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
IS | 05.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 05.03.2014 | |
CZ | 05.03.2014 | ||
EE | 05.03.2014 | ||
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
BG | 05.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 05.03.2014 | |
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
LV | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 05.03.2014 | |
FI | 05.03.2014 | ||
LT | 05.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 05.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3275586 (WURSTNER ROBERT G, et al) [X] 12 * column 1, lines 13-17 * * column 3, lines 3-13 * * column 4, lines 44-47; examples 1-8; claims 1-3 *; | [X]US3464156 (ROGERS DILWORTH T, et al) [X] 12* examples 2,5 *; | [X]US3703393 (KOONS RUSSELL E) [X] 1-11 * column 3, lines 60-69; examples I-IV *; | [XD]US5990206 (TANAKA SHINGO [JP], et al) [XD] 1-11 * column 1, lines 10-22; examples 1-10; claims 1,6 * * column 4, lines 11-13 * * column 5, lines 28-46 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 6 *; | [X]US6569351 (BAUMGARDNER GAYLON L [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 1, lines 8-14 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 10; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | JPS51149312 | US4145322 | US4437896 | US5990206 | US6024788 | US6569351 | US20060813950 |