EP2187136 - Method for operating a system for transporting thermal energy through a liquid medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brüning, Olaf Hauptstrasse 62 71543 Wüstenrot / DE | [2010/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/20] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/30] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/20] | Wörz, Volker Alfred Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012892.7 | 13.10.2009 | [2010/20] | Priority number, date | DE20081057730 | 17.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008057730 | [2010/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2187136 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2187136 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F24D12/02, F24D19/10, G05D23/19 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
F24D19/1012 (EP,US);
F24D12/02 (EP);
G05D23/1934 (EP);
F24D2200/043 (EP);
Y02B30/00 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/20] | F24D12/02, F24D19/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Systems zum Transport thermischer Energie über ein flüssiges Medium | [2010/20] | English: | Method for operating a system for transporting thermal energy through a liquid medium | [2010/20] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un système de transport d'énergie thermique sur un support fluide | [2010/20] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2010 | Observations by third parties | 06.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/16] | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0445310 (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [Y] 1,7,9,14,15 * page 5, line 51 - page 6, line 12; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 2-6,8,10-13,16; | [YDA]EP0874200 (ELECTROWATT TECH INNOVAT CORP [CH]) [YD] 1,7,9,14,15 * column 1, line 57 - column 4, line 55; figures 2,3; claims 1-3,6 * [A] 2-6,8,10-13,16; | [AD]EP1154205 (GERSTER EUGEN [DE]) [AD] 1-16* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figure 1; claims 1-2 * | Examination | - MÜLLER C, "Kundennutzen wissensbasierter, analytischer Regler in der HLK - technik", GLT ANWNDERTAGE,, (20020925), pages 1 - 24, XP003026631 | - Regeln und Steuern von Heizungsanlagen passage, REGELN UND STEUERN VON HEIZUNGSANLAGEN, SIEMENS, DE, PAGE(S) 1 - 131, (20040101), XP003026630 | - Mehrkesselanlagen optimieren ED - Weishaupt, PRODUKTINFORMATION ÜBER MEHRKESSELANLAGEN, DE, PAGE(S) 1 - 8, (20050701), XP003026629 | by applicant | EP0874200 | EP1154205 | other | EP1154205 | - "System Weishaupt", Weishaupt Info Mehrkesselanlagen optimieren, pages 1 - 8, XP003026629 | - Regeln und Steuern von Heizungsanlagen, SIEMENS, pages 1 - 131, XP003026630 | - C. MÜLLER, "Kundennutzen wissensbasierter, analytischer Regler in der HLK - technik", HONEYWELL, (20020925), pages 1 - 24, XP003026631 |