EP2311374 - Apparatus for retrieving and analysing blood; coupling mechanism for lancets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
List, Hans Siegfriedstrasse 27 64754 Hesseneck-Kailbach / DE | 02 /
Fluegge, Kai Blücherplatz 22 52068 Aachen / DE | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Durm Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Durm & Partner Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 09012895.0 | 13.10.2009 | [2011/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311374 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/155 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/15128 (EP,US);
A61B5/151 (KR);
A61B5/14532 (US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150198 (EP,US);
A61B5/150358 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (US);
A61B5/150419 (EP,US);
A61B5/150435 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150732 (US);
A61B5/15111 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
A61B5/1513 (EP,US);
A61B5/15132 (EP,US);
A61B5/15151 (EP,US);
A61B5/15161 (EP,US);
G01N33/49 (KR);
G01N35/10 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Apparat zur Gewinnung und Analyse einer Blutprobe; Lanzettenkopplungsmechanismus | [2011/16] | English: | Apparatus for retrieving and analysing blood; coupling mechanism for lancets | [2011/16] | French: | Appareil pour obtention et analyse du sang; mécanisme pour couplage d'une lancette | [2011/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1880671 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038]; figure 3 * [A] 13; | [XA]WO2008145628 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1, 6 * [A] 2-12; | [XA]WO2004064636 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 14, line 25 - page 15, line 4; figures 16, 17 * [A] 13; | [XI]EP2039293 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0054] , [ 0059] , [ 0071] , [ 0076]; figures 2B, 3A-C * [I] 7-12; | [XA]EP2042098 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0031]; figures 3, 8, 12 * [A] 2-13; | [XA]US2004102803 (BOECKER DIRK [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0182]; figure 73 * [A] 2-12; | [X]WO2008145625 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2, 6 *; | [XI]WO03071940 (FACET TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * figure 29 * * page 32, line 28 - page 34, line 29; figures 29-32 * [I] 7-12; | [X]EP1997429 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 13-15 * paragraphs [0017] , [ 0045]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2004060446 (PELIKAN TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 13-15 * figure 59 * * page 32, line 20 - line 31 *; | [X]EP1790288 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 13 * figure 6 *; | [E]EP2113197 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 13 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP2050392 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 13 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0017] , [ 0020] , [ 0025] *; | [A]US2007191738 (RANEY CHARLES C [US], et al) [A] 13 * figure 5 * | by applicant | WO2009030340 | WO2009027010 | US2004092995 | EP1333756 | EP1669028 | EP20080010403 |