EP2204181 - Protease inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRUSTEES OF TUFTS COLLEGE Ballou Hall Medford, MA 02155 / US | [2010/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bachovchin, William W. 75 Cambridge Parkway, Apartment E609 Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2010/32] |
Former [2010/27] | 01 /
Bachovchin, William W. 7 Warwick Street Melrose, MA 02176 / US | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | [2013/42] |
Former [2010/27] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street GB-Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09012951.1 | 30.04.2003 | [2010/27] | Priority number, date | US20020376636P | 30.04.2002 Original published format: US 376636 P | [2010/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2204181 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2204181 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, C07K5/08, C07K5/10 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/64 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07F5/025 (EP,US);
C07K5/06052 (US);
C07K5/06078 (EP,US);
C07K5/06191 (EP,US);
C07K5/0817 (EP,US);
C07K5/0827 (EP,US);
C07K5/1008 (EP,US);
C07K5/101 (US);
C07K5/1013 (EP,US);
C07K5/1016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/27] | Title | German: | Protease-Hemmer | [2010/27] | English: | Protease inhibitors | [2010/27] | French: | Inhibiteurs de protéase | [2010/27] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 07.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03726564.2 / EP1499336 | Divisional application(s) | EP10011375.2 / EP2319523 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030726564) is 27.01.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5776902 (BACHOVCHIN WILLIAM W [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO8903223 (BACHOVCHIN WILLIAM W [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0195212 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US4499082 (SHENVI ASHOKKUMAR B [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - BIOCHEMISTRY., US AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA., (19931130), vol. 32, no. 47, pages 12651 - 12655, XP000609102 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00210a013 | [X] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, US AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD., (19900305), vol. 265, no. 7, pages 3738 - 3743, XP000103667 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., US AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC., (19980318), vol. 120, no. 10, pages 2211 - 2217, XP002323535 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9720220 | by applicant | WO9734927 | US5834428 | WO9408051 | US5359115 | US5362899 | US5288514 | US5736412 | US5712171 | WO9210092 | WO9309668 | WO9107087 | WO9320242 | - CUYPERS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 257, page 7086 | - SCHECHTER; BERGER, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1967), vol. 27, pages 157 - 162 | - GOLDBERG ET AL., CHEM. & BIOL., (1995), vol. 2, pages 503 - 508 | - COUX ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 65, pages 801 - 847 | - DESHAIES, TRENDS CELL BIOL., (1995), vol. 5, pages 428 - 434 | - GANTT ET AL., ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1998), vol. 42, pages 2731 - 2738 | - RETTIG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 3110 - 3114 | - RETTIG ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 3327 - 3335 | - SCANLAN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 5657 - 5661 | - WELT ET AL., J CLIN. ONCOL., (1994), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 1193 - 1203 | - DRUCKER ET AL., PNAS, (1996), vol. 93, page 7911 | - KUBIAK ET AL., PEPTIDE RES, (1994), vol. 7, page 153 | - The Peptides, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1981), vol. 3, pages 3 - 88 | - Burger's Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Discovery, vol. 1 | - WILDING ET AL., J ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1992), vol. 132, pages 299 - 302 | - STANLEY ET AL., PHYSIOLOGY AND BEHAVIOR, (1989), vol. 46, pages 173 - 177 | - BLONDELLE ET AL., TRENDS ANAL. CHEM., (1995), vol. 14, page 83 | - CHEN ET AL., JACS, (1994), vol. 116, page 2661 | - KERR ET AL., JACS, (1993), vol. 115, page 252 |