EP2159322 - Paper substrates containing an antimicrobial compound as well as methods of making and using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY 400 Atlantic Street Stamford, CT 06921 / US | [2010/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holbert, Victor, P. 6748 Little River Lane Loveland OH 45140 / US | 02 /
Kulkarni, Sandeep 4501 May Apple Drive Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | 03 /
Williams, Richard, C. 7010 Greenstone Trace Loveland OH 45140 / US | 04 /
Faber, Richard, D. 7784 October Rose Cove Memphis TN 38119 / US | [2010/14] |
Former [2010/09] | 01 /
Holbert, Victor, P. 6748 Little River Lane Loveland OH 45140 / US | ||
02 /
Kulkarni, Sandeep 6074 Wedgewood Drive Morrow OH 45152 / US | |||
03 /
Williams, Richard, C. 7010 Greenstone Trace Loveland OH 45140 / US | |||
04 /
Faber, Richard, D. 7784 October Rose Cove Memphis TN 38119 / US | Representative(s) | Schneider, Michael, et al Heisse Kursawe Eversheds Brienner Strasse 12 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Schneider, Michael, et al Heisse Kursawe Eversheds Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Maximiliansplatz 5 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/09] | Schneider, Michael, et al Hammonds Karl-Scharnagel-Ring 7 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09013229.1 | 06.07.2005 | [2010/09] | Priority number, date | US20040585757P | 06.07.2004 Original published format: US 585757 P | [2010/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2159322 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2159322 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/36 | [2010/09] | CPC: |
D21H21/36 (EP,US);
A01N25/34 (EP,US);
A01N43/80 (US);
D21H17/14 (US);
D21H17/61 (US);
D21H19/00 (EP,US);
D21H27/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/34, A01N43/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/09] | Title | German: | Papiersubstrate mit antimikrobieller Verbindung sowie Herstellungs- und Anwendungsverfahren dafür | [2010/09] | English: | Paper substrates containing an antimicrobial compound as well as methods of making and using the same | [2010/09] | French: | Substrats de papier contenant un composant antimicrobien ainsi que ses procédés de fabrication et son utilisation | [2010/09] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2009 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 04.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05771020.4 / EP1774100 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050771020) is 27.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2005 | AT | 21.01.2015 | BE | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | ES | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | IT | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | NL | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | GB | 06.07.2015 | IE | 06.07.2015 | LU | 06.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | FR | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/40] | HU | 06.07.2005 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 06.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.07.2015 | ||
IE | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 06.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 06.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 06.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
GB | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 06.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
IT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
NL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 21.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2003201700 ; | [X]US3560332 (CRANDALL HENRY C, et al) [X] 1-12 * column 2, line 36 - line 50 * * claim 1 *; | [AD]US3936339 (LOCK JAMES A, et al) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US4533435 (INTILI HENRY S [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2002083671 (CLAUSEN ARNE [CA], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]WO02085539 (INT PAPER CO [US]) [X] 1-12 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2003170317 (CURZON JON LEE [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004149409 (KLIMPL FRED [US], et al) [PX] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0018] *; | [PY]EP1527685 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [PY] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 12 * * page 4, paragraph 18 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003201700 A 20030718 (SANYO ITAGAMI KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | US3560332 | US4533435 | WO02085539 | US2003170317 |