EP2146469 - Fading frequency decision device and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/01] | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2010/03] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okumura, Yukihiko c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Ando, Hidehiro c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Usuda, Masafumi c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
Ishikawa, Yoshihiro c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
Onoe, Seizo c/o NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Zangs, Rainer E., et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Zangs, Rainer E., et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09013625.0 | 31.03.2000 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | JP19990096804 | 02.04.1999 Original published format: JP 9680499 | JP19990340638 | 30.11.1999 Original published format: JP 34063899 | JP20000082929 | 23.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000082929 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146469 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146469 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04B1/707 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
H04L25/0234 (EP,KR,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B1/7115 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0228 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Fadingfrequenzentscheidung | [2010/03] | English: | Fading frequency decision device and method | [2010/03] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de décision d'évanouissement de fréquence | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 04.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00913048.5 / EP1089451 | EP07075319.9 / EP1816753 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0715440 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 46 - line 48 * | by applicant | - SANPEI, "Land Mobile Communication 16QAM Fading Distortion Compensation", ELECTRONIC INFORMATION COMMUNICATION SOCIETY JOURNAL, (198901), vol. J72-B-11, no. 1, pages 7 - 15 | - ANDO, "RAKE Reception Using the Multislot Weighted Averaging Channel Estimation Method with Pilot Symbols in DS-CDMA", ELECTRONIC INFORMATION COMMUNICATION SOCIETY TECHNICAL REPORT RCS97-74 |