EP2169952 - Systems and methods for episode tracking in an interactive midea environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | [2015/37] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 2830 De La Cruz Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95050 / US | ||
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states United Video Properties, Inc. 6922 Hollywood Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90028 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cordray, Charles 200 Mercer Street, Apt. 2B New York New York 10012 / US | 02 /
Walker, Todd, A. 77 Highpoint Drive Berwyn Pennsylvania 19312 / US | 03 /
Armaly, Samir, B. 4400 Belair Drive La Canada California 91011 / US | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/13] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09013672.2 | 08.12.2006 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | US20050324156 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 324156 | US20050323464 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 323464 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2169952 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2169952 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/458, H04N21/466, H04N21/482 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
H04N7/16 (EP);
H04N21/252 (EP);
H04N21/42206 (EP);
H04N21/458 (EP);
H04N21/466 (EP);
H04N21/4667 (EP);
H04N21/4751 (EP);
H04N21/4826 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | H04N7/16, H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Episodenverfolgung in einer interaktiven Medienumgebung | [2010/13] | English: | Systems and methods for episode tracking in an interactive midea environment | [2010/13] | French: | Systèmes et procédé de suivi d'épisode dans un environnement interactif média | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 19.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2011 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 28.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06839252.1 / EP1969844 | Divisional application(s) | EP14177889.4 / EP2802142 | EP16186673.6 / EP3169061 | EP16186676.9 / EP3169062 | EP16207344.9 / EP3206393 | EP17210591.8 / EP3346697 | EP17210592.6 / EP3346698 | EP20183325.8 / EP3739876 | EP20183327.4 / EP3754972 | EP24185538.6 / EP4415372 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060839252) is 17.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2015
28.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE Virgin Media Limited Media House Bartley Wood Business Park Hook Hampshire RG27 9UP / GB Opponent's representative Martin, Philip John Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.04.2015
28.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE Virgin Media Limited Media House Bartley Wood Business Park Hook Hampshire RG27 9UP / GB Opponent's representative Gwilt, Julia Louise Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | 27.05.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.12.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.09.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.02.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/16] | Appeal following opposition | 20.12.2016 | Appeal received No. T0017/17 | 13.02.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 19.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 19.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 19.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2011 | Decision despatched | 27.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 11.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 11.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 11.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/35] |
Former [2012/36] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 05.07.2012 | ||
[2014/35] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2006 | AT | 23.07.2014 | BE | 23.07.2014 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | NL | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | IE | 08.12.2014 | LU | 08.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
IE | 08.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 08.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 23.07.2014 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9965237 (METABYTE INC [US]); | [A]WO0184340 (ON24 INC [US]); | [XY]WO0207433 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]WO0242959 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]US2003061610 (ERRICO JAMES H [US]); | [X]US2003208763 (MCELHATTEN DAVID [US], et al); | [X]US2004111756 (STUCKMAN BRUCE E [US], et al); | [A]US2005055715 (MINNICK DAN [US], et al); | [A]EP1534014 (ENSEQUENCE INC [US]); | [X]US2005235316 (AHMAD-TAYLOR TY O [US]); | [PX]WO2006060157 (SBC KNOWLEDGE VENTURES LP [US]) | by applicant | US2001047298 | US2003149988 | US2005229213 |