EP2264627 - Mobile terminal and method of performing functions using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeong, Woo Young c/o LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 327-23, Kasan-dong Kumchon-gu Seoul, 153-801 / KR | [2010/51] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/51] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09013795.1 | 03.11.2009 | [2010/51] | Priority number, date | KR20090054816 | 19.06.2009 Original published format: KR 20090054816 | [2010/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2264627 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2264627 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04M1/725, G01J3/46 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/0256 (EP,US);
G01J3/0264 (EP,US);
G01J3/0272 (EP,US);
G01J3/46 (EP,US);
G01J3/463 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (EP,US);
H04M1/72445 (EP,US);
H04M1/0272 (EP,US);
H04M2250/12 (EP,US);
H04M2250/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | G06F17/30, H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Verfahren zur Ausführung von Funktionen damit | [2010/51] | English: | Mobile terminal and method of performing functions using the same | [2010/51] | French: | Terminal mobile et son procédé pour effectuer des fonctions en l'utilisant | [2010/51] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 20.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/02] | 31.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/02] | 23.08.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6157454 (WAGNER GREGG A [US], et al) [X] 7,8,11,15 * column 1, line 20 - line 25; figure 6 * * column 2, line 34 - line 65 * * column 3, line 27 - line 46 * * column 5, line 33 - line 40 * * column 6, line 11 - line 66 * * column 7, line 51 - column 8, line 3 * [I] 9,10; | [XI]US2002159065 (BERSTIS VIKTORS [US]) [X] 7,8,11,15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0016] , [0018] , [0026] - [0028] - [0030] , [0033] * [I] 9,10; | [Y]JP2005236470 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) [Y] 1-6,13,14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0022] - [0027] *; | [X]WO2008060580 (24EIGHT LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,13 * paragraphs [0005] , [0019] , [0022] , [0025] *; | [Y] - Alex Chitu, "Google Image Search Color Filter", (20090408), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://googlesystem.blogspot.com/2009/04/google-image-search-color-filter.html, (20100804), XP002595206 [Y] 1-6,13,14 * the whole document * | [I] - Thordis Bonfranchi-Simovic, "Farbpicker der nächsten Generation", (20090529), pages 1 - 1, URL: http://www.webwork-tools.de/2009/05/farbpicker-der-naechsten-generation/, (20101112), XP002609369 [I] 7-11,15 * the whole document * | [A] - Michael Huber, "Multicolr Search durchsucht Flickr nach Farben", (20081203), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://michael.mind-exchange.com/multicolr-search-durchsucht-flickr-nach-farben-1288, (20100804), XP002595293 [A] 1-6,13,14 * page 1 * | Examination | - ANONYMOUS, "Learn to use tools and make pictures with Windows Paint", (20040603), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20040603020730/http://fay.iniminimo.com/paint.html, (20120705), XP055031898 | by applicant | US6157454 | US2002159065 |