EP2239759 - Substrate treatment apparatus, substrate treatment method, preliminary electrode structure, measuring electrode structure, and process electrode structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 371-1, Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-701 / KR | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Hong-Young 2327, Department of Physics 373-1 Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon, 305-701 / KR | 02 /
Lee, Hun-Su 2327, Department of Physics 373-1 Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon, 305-701 / KR | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Robert Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | Harrison, Michael Robert Harrison IP Limited Marlborough House Westminster Place York Business Park Nether Poppleton York YO26 6RW / GB | Application number, filing date | 09014045.0 | 10.11.2009 | [2010/41] | Priority number, date | KR20090029424 | 06.04.2009 Original published format: KR 20090029424 | [2010/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2239759 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2239759 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2010/41] | CPC: |
H01J37/32541 (EP,KR);
H01J37/3244 (KR);
H01J37/32568 (KR);
H01L21/67017 (KR);
H01L21/687 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Substratbehandlungsvorrichtung, Substratbehandlungsverfahren, Vorelektrodenstruktur, Messelektrodenstruktur und Prozesselektrodenstruktur | [2010/41] | English: | Substrate treatment apparatus, substrate treatment method, preliminary electrode structure, measuring electrode structure, and process electrode structure | [2010/41] | French: | Appareil de traitement de substrat, procédé de traitement de substrat, structure d'électrode préliminaire, structure d'électrode de mesure, et structure d'électrode de processus | [2010/41] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 10.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS644481 (SUGAWARA MINORU) [X] 10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5820947 (ITOH KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,3, * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 20 *; | [A]JP2001135626 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]JP2001271168 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002237460 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 *; | [XI]EP1595974 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [X] 10,12-15 * abstract * * figures 2,3,6B-6G, 7A-7E, 12I-12K * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0104] - paragraph [0107] * * tables 3,4,5 * [I] 1-9,11 |