EP2282187 - Inspecting device including detachable probe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Plant Service & Engineering Co., Ltd. KPS Migeum-ro 1 Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-726 / KR | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Min Su 804-902, Kunyoung Apt. Jukjeon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-160 / KR | 02 /
Woo, Jang Myong 312-806, Yanghyeon Maeul Sinan Apt. Singal-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-589 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Kyung Sub 104-403, Jugong Greenville Apt. Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-792 / KR | 04 /
Choi, Sang Hoon C-401, Plusville Apt. 728-15 Pungdeokcheon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-170 / KR | [2012/22] |
Former [2011/06] | 01 /
Park, Min Su 804-902, Kunyoung Apt. Jukjeon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-160 / KR | ||
02 /
Woo, Jang Myong 312-806, Yanghyeon Maeul Sinan Apt. Singal-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-589 / KR | |||
03 /
Kim, Kyung Sub 104-403, Jugong Greenville Apt. Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-792 / KR | |||
04 /
Choi, Sang Hoon C-401, Plusville Apt. 728-15 Pungdeokcheon-dong Suji-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 448-170 / KR | Representative(s) | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09014223.3 | 13.11.2009 | [2011/06] | Priority number, date | KR20090072254 | 06.08.2009 Original published format: KR 20090072254 | [2011/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282187 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2282187 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/00, G01N21/954 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
F22B37/005 (EP,KR,US);
G01N21/954 (EP,KR,US);
G21C17/017 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Title | German: | Prüfgerät mit abnehmbarer Sonde | [2011/06] | English: | Inspecting device including detachable probe | [2011/06] | French: | Dispositif d'inspection incluant une sonde détachable | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2009 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2009 | AT | 30.05.2012 | BE | 30.05.2012 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | DK | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | FI | 30.05.2012 | HR | 30.05.2012 | IT | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | MK | 30.05.2012 | MT | 30.05.2012 | NL | 30.05.2012 | PL | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SE | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | SM | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | NO | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | ES | 10.09.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | IE | 13.11.2012 | LU | 13.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 13.11.2009 | |
AT | 30.05.2012 | ||
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
SM | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
LU | 13.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
SM | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
LU | 13.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
MT | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 13.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
BE | 30.05.2012 | ||
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
HR | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
NO | 30.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | |
NO | 30.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5090259 (SHISHIDO YOSHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 14, lines 49-51 * * column 40, line 22 - column 41, line 20 * [A] 6-11; | [A]GB2255814 (CONOCO INC [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [YA]US6232773 (JACOBS SCOTT K [CA], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 1, line 40 - column 2, line 47 * * column 4, line 60 - column 6, line 10 * [A] 6-11; | [YA]US2002190682 (SCHEMPF HAGEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] , [0057] - [0063] * [A] 6-11; | [A]US6820653 (SCHEMPF HAGEN [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 35 * * column 13, lines 19-41 * | by applicant | US5090259 | US6232773 | US2002190682 |