EP2175464 - Seating detection switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Fujikura, Ltd. 5-1, Kiba 1-chome Koto-ku Tokyo 135-8512 / JP | ||
For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawahira, Tetsuya c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura works, 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Takahiro c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura works, 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Mikihito c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
Shindo, Toyohiko c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
Kumakiri, Naotaka c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 06 /
Yoshifuku, Masashi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 07 /
Furukawa, Takashi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 08 /
Koyota, Nobuhiro c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 09 /
Terasaki, Tsutomu c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2012/06] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
Kawahira, Tetsuya c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura works, 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | ||
02 /
Ishii, Takahiro c/o Fujikura Ltd. Sakura works, 1440 Mutsuzaki Sakura-shi Chiba 285-8550 / JP | |||
03 /
Kojima, Mikihito c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
04 /
Shindo, Toyohiko c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
05 /
Kumakiri, Naotaka c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
06 /
Yoshifuku, Masashi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
07 /
Furukawa, Takashi c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
08 /
Koyota, Nobuhiro c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | |||
09 /
Terasaki, Tsutomu c/o K.K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09014239.9 | 19.05.2004 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | JP20030141513 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003141513 | JP20030180632 | 25.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003180632 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175464 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175464 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01H13/70 | [2010/15] | CPC: |
H01H13/704 (EP,US);
B60N2/002 (US);
B60N2/0021 (EP);
B60N2/0025 (EP);
B60N2/0034 (EP);
B60N2/0035 (EP);
B60R21/015 (EP,US);
B60N2210/46 (EP);
H01H2209/01 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/15] | Title | German: | Sitzerkennungsschalter | [2010/15] | English: | Seating detection switch | [2010/15] | French: | Commutateur de détection d'assise | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04733947.8 / EP1626423 | EP08016886.7 / EP2003668 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040733947) is 13.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9829849 (AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LAB [US]); | [A]JPH11297153 (FUJIKURA LTD) | by applicant | JPH09315199 | JP2909961B |