blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2325018

EP2325018 - Thermally sensitive recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2012
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.12.2012  [2012/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mondi Uncoated Fine & Kraft Paper GmbH
Kelsenstrasse 7
1032 Wien / AT
[2011/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Kornherr, Andreas Dr
Katharinengasse 16/3/23
1100 Wien / AT
02 / Schalkhammer, Thomas Dr.
Kasten Nr. 105
3072 Kasten / AT
03 / Palkovits, Roland Dr.
Hans Otto Stagl Gasse 7/4
2700 Wiener Neustadt / AT
 [2011/21]
Representative(s)Landgraf, Elvira
Schulfeld 26
4210 Gallneukirchen / AT
[2011/21]
Application number, filing date09014587.124.11.2009
[2011/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2325018
Date:25.05.2011
Language:DE
[2011/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2010
ClassificationIPC:B41M5/32
[2011/21]
CPC:
B41M5/32 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/21]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Thermisch sensibles Aufzeichnungsmaterial[2011/21]
English:Thermally sensitive recording material[2011/21]
French:Matériel d'enregistrement sensible thermiquement[2011/21]
Examination procedure29.11.2011Examination requested  [2012/09]
08.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/51]
26.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.02.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
BE, EE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, AT
18.01.2012Request for further processing filed
18.01.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.02.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
18.01.2012Request for further processing filed
18.01.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.02.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3983279  (MATSUSHITA HIROMU, et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 6 - line 9 * * column 6, line 4 - line 12 * * example 1 *;
 [X]US4531141  (SAGAWA BURT K [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 7 - line 12 * * column 2, line 35 - line 46 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 19; example 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]US4861749  (SATAKE TOSHIMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 1, line 9 - line 12 * * column 3, line 12 - line 18 * * column 6, line 50 - line 65 ** claim 1; table 1 *;
 [X]EP1382459  (SIHL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0021] , [0024] , [0025]; examples 1-4; claims 1,7,8 *
by applicantGB943401
 NL267030
 NL248292
 BE595169
 GB191016515
 GB856188
 GB991599
 DE1269630
 FR2028486
 DE1946393
 NL7103180
 DE2112380
 FR2084649
 GB1292831
 GB1350930
 GB1469437
 JPS5787987
 JPS57207659
 JPS58183769
 JPS6063192
 JPS6083886
 JPS6083885
 US4849396
 JPH01241487
 JPH01271284
 JPH02265978
 JPH04307289
 EP0526072
 US5256621
 US5446009
 JPH0959547
 EP0968837
 WO0035679
 US6093678
 KR20040012361
 JP2005272762
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.