EP2192060 - Device for transporting workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reichmann + Sohn GmbH Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 6-8 89264 Weissenhorn / DE | [2010/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobisch, Bernhard Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 6 89264 Weissenhorn / DE | 02 /
Kosmowski, Frank Treuliebstrasse 16 89287 Bellenberg / DE | 03 /
Kustermann, Karl Kaubtal 10 73340 Amstetten-Stuberheim / DE | [2013/28] |
Former [2010/22] | 01 /
Tobisch, Bernhard Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 6 89264 Weissenhorn / DE | ||
02 /
Kosmowski, Frank Treuliebstrasse 16 89287 Weissenhorn / DE | |||
03 /
Kustermann, Karl Kaubtal 10 73340 Amstetten-Stuberheim / DE | Representative(s) | Dziewior, Joachim Ensingerstrasse 21 89073 Ulm / DE | [2013/46] |
Former [2010/22] | Dziewior, Joachim Ensingerstrasse 21 89073 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 09014604.4 | 24.11.2009 | [2010/22] | Priority number, date | DE20081059102 | 26.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008059102 | DE20081059101 | 26.11.2008 Original published format: DE102008059101 | [2010/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2192060 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2192060 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2192060 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G21/20, A63C11/04 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
B65G21/2054 (EP);
A63C11/04 (EP);
A63C5/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/22] | B65G21/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/22] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Transport von Werkstücken | [2010/22] | English: | Device for transporting workpieces | [2010/22] | French: | Dispositif de transport de pièces | [2010/22] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 02.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.11.2009 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | DK | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | ES | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | HR | 13.11.2013 | IT | 13.11.2013 | LT | 13.11.2013 | LV | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | MK | 13.11.2013 | MT | 13.11.2013 | NL | 13.11.2013 | PL | 13.11.2013 | RO | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | SM | 13.11.2013 | TR | 13.11.2013 | IE | 24.11.2013 | LU | 24.11.2013 | BE | 30.11.2013 | GB | 13.02.2014 | NO | 13.02.2014 | GR | 14.02.2014 | IS | 13.03.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 24.11.2009 | |
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MK | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
LU | 24.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 13.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 24.11.2009 | |
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
GR | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
LU | 24.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 13.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 24.11.2009 | |
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
LU | 24.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 13.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 13.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 13.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 13.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
GB | 13.02.2014 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
IE | 24.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 13.11.2013 | |
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 13.11.2013 | |
NO | 13.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1685880 (WINTERSTEIGER AG [AT]) [A] 1,9,12,15 * paragraph [0015]; figure 1 *; | [A]US4987282 (CHASTAIN WILLIAM P [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 5, lines 52-68; figure 2 * | by applicant | EP1685880 |