blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2327732

EP2327732 - Polyurethane based thickening agent [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2012
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.12.2012  [2012/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cognis IP Management GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/22]For all designated states
Cognis IP Management GmbH
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Münzenberg Cindy
Brehmstr. 11
40239 Düsseldorf / DE
02 / Pietsch Oliver
Pfälzer Weg 6a
45481 Mülheim / DE
03 / Wick Anja
Forstbachstr. 22
40723 Hilden / DE
04 / Mahnke Eike Ulf
Theodor-Körner-Str. 18
42553 Velbert / DE
05 / Birnbrich Paul
Untenitter 3
42719 Solingen / DE
 [2011/22]
Application number, filing date09014771.127.11.2009
[2011/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2327732
Date:01.06.2011
Language:DE
[2011/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2010
ClassificationIPC:C08G18/08, C08G18/28, C08G18/48, C09D7/12
[2011/22]
CPC:
C08G18/755 (EP,US); C08G18/2825 (EP,US); C08G18/4833 (EP,US);
C09D7/43 (EP,US); C08L75/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2011/22]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Polyurethan-basierte Verdickungsmittel[2011/22]
English:Polyurethane based thickening agent[2011/22]
French:Épaississant à base de polyuréthane[2011/22]
Examination procedure17.11.2011Examination requested  [2011/52]
12.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/51]
31.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE102006023001  (COGNIS IP MAN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0011] , [0017] , [0028]; examples 1,2,1a,2a; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]WO2006002813  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * pages 3-4; examples 1,2,1a-1c,2a-2c; claims 1-9 *;
 [A]EP1566393  (COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0017] - [0019]; examples 1,1a; claims 1,7-10 *;
 [A]WO0238645  (AVECIA LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 6, lines 15-27; claims 1,11 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.