EP2194154 - Two-way shape-recovery alloy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daido Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha 1-10, Higashisakura 1-chome Higashi-ku Nagoya Aichi / JP | [2010/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozaki, Kozo c/o Daido Tokushuko Kabushiki Kaisha Daido Corporate Research & Development Center 30,2-chome, Daido-cho Minami-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 457-8545 / JP | [2010/23] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09015086.3 | 04.12.2009 | [2010/23] | Priority number, date | JP20080309262 | 04.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008309262 | JP20090266700 | 24.11.2009 Original published format: JP 2009266700 | [2010/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2194154 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/18, C22C38/34, C22C38/38, C21D6/00 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
C22C38/58 (EP,US);
C21D6/004 (EP,US);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C21D2201/01 (EP,US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zweiwege Formwiederherstellungslegierung | [2010/23] | English: | Two-way shape-recovery alloy | [2010/23] | French: | Alliage à récupération de forme bidirectionnelle | [2010/23] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 24.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0430754 (UGINE ACIERS [FR]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, lines 4-40; table I *; | [X]WO9703215 (ULLAKKO KARI MARTTI [FI], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 6, line 14 - page 10, line 14; table I *; | [XD]JPH1036943 (PACIFIC METALS CO LTD, et al) [XD] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0489160 (NISSHIN STEEL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * table 1 *; | [A]JPH04365837 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-15 * table 1 * |