EP2196265 - Decanter centrifuge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2015/10] |
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | ||
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Montag, Tobias Am Höllenbach 8 97532 Üchtelhausen / DE | 02 /
Zylla, Josef Lindenstrasse 29 97453 Schonungen / DE | [2010/24] | Application number, filing date | 09015121.8 | 07.12.2009 | [2010/24] | Priority number, date | DE20081062160 | 13.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008062160 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2196265 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2196265 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B04B1/20, B04B9/12 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
B04B1/20 (EP);
B04B9/12 (EP);
F16C2300/14 (EP);
F16C32/0408 (EP);
F16C32/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dekanterzentrifuge | [2010/24] | English: | Decanter centrifuge | [2010/24] | French: | Centrifugeuse pour décanteur | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 11.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102006006178 (WESTFALIA SEPARATOR AG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19731313 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * Zusammenfassung; column 1, lines 35-56; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2404217 (BOEHRINGER ANDREAS) [A] 1 * Zusammenfassung; page 20, paragraph 3 - page 21, paragraph 2; figure 8; claims 1,14 * |