EP2333364 - Self-lubricating composite bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Newcera Technology Co., Ltd. Britannia House, 22, 2nd Floor, Cator Road Bandar Seri Begawan BS 8811 Brunei Darussalam / BN | [2012/32] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Newcera Technology Co., Ltd. Britannia House, 22, 2nd Floor, Cator Road Bandar Seri Begawan BS 8811 Brunei Darussalam / BN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Han-Ching 3F, No. 25, Lane 42 Bojyue Street Sijhih City, Taipei County / TW | 02 /
Huang, Lung-Wei 7F, No. 88, Ho-Ping Road North District Hsinchu City / TW | [2012/32] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
Liu, Han-Ching 3F, No. 25, Lane 42, Bojyue Street Sijhih City, Taipei County / TW | ||
02 /
Huang, Lung-Wei 7F, No. 88, Ho-Ping Road North District Hsinchu City / TW | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt a. M. / DE | ||
Former [2011/24] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09015138.2 | 07.12.2009 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2333364 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2333364 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/02, F16C33/10 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
F16C17/02 (EP);
F16C33/103 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Title | German: | Selbstschmierendes mehrteiliges Gleitlager | [2011/24] | English: | Self-lubricating composite bearing | [2011/24] | French: | Palier pluripartite auto-lubrifiant | [2011/24] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2009 | AT | 08.08.2012 | BE | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | HR | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | MK | 08.08.2012 | MT | 08.08.2012 | NL | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | SM | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | NO | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | IE | 07.12.2012 | LU | 07.12.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 07.12.2009 | |
AT | 08.08.2012 | ||
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
SM | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
LU | 07.12.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
SM | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
LU | 07.12.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.12.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2006171618 (SHIH CHIN-YEN [TW]) [X] 1-3,6-7 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 8,10 [I] 4-5,9,14-15; | [XYI]GB1389857 (THOMSON J B) [X] 1,11,14 * page 3, lines 90-123 * * page 4, lines 25-58; figures 1-3,7 * [Y] 8,10 [I] 4; | [XI]US3917362 (STEDMAN ROBERT N) [X] 1,11,16 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 24; figure 1 * [I] 4,12-15; | [XI]JP2004144255 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,5,11 * paragraph [0024]; figure 6 * * abstract * [I] 4,12-15 | by applicant | US2006171618 | GB1389857 |