EP2196611 - Door and bodywork of a passenger vehicle with special protective equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoerbiger Automatisierungstechnik Holding GmbH Südliche Römerstrasse 15 86972 Altenstadt / DE | [2013/30] |
Former [2010/24] | For all designated states Hoerbiger Automatisierungstechnik Holding GmbH Martina-Hörbiger-Strasse 5 86956 Schongau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knaack, Andre Daimlerstraße 2a 93077 Bad Abbach / DE | 02 /
Speckner, Mario Weidenhüller Weg 4 91257 Pegnitz / DE | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 09015164.8 | 08.12.2009 | [2010/24] | Priority number, date | DE20081061317 | 11.12.2008 Original published format: DE102008061317 | [2010/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2196611 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/24] | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/00, E05F15/08, F41H7/04 | [2010/24] | CPC: |
F41H5/263 (EP);
E05F15/40 (EP);
E05F15/57 (EP);
F41H5/226 (EP);
F41H5/26 (EP);
E05F11/445 (EP);
E05Y2201/41 (EP);
E05Y2201/448 (EP);
E05Y2800/252 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tür und Karosserie eines eine Sonderschutzausstattung aufweisenden Personenkraftwagens | [2010/24] | English: | Door and bodywork of a passenger vehicle with special protective equipment | [2010/24] | French: | Porte et carrosserie d'un véhicule de transport de passagers comprenant un équipement de protection particulier | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |