12.10.2018 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
27.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
27.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
28.07.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
14.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
21.03.2017 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
10.03.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
13.11.2016 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
04.11.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Opposition filed |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
29.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] |
04.12.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
10.11.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.11.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.11.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.09.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
31.07.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
17.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.09.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
19.09.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] |
22.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.05.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.05.2013 |
First examination report |
|
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.12.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.07.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
15.06.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
01.06.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
01.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
01.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
04.05.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
02.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
02.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
14.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
18.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] |
05.02.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
05.02.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
27.01.2010 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|