EP2160956 - Toothbrushes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Revocation of patent | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company LLC One Gillette Park Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2016/49] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states The Gillette Company One Gillette Park- 3E Boston, MA 02127 / US | ||
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states The Gillette Company One Gillette Park- 3E Boston, MA 02127 / US | ||
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Phillipp M. 128 Beechwood Hill Trail Exeter, RI 02822 / US | 02 /
Brown, William R., Jr. 6 Gemma Drive Peabody, MA 01960 / US | 03 /
Chenvainu, Alexander T. 69 Robbins Road Sudbury, MA 01776 / US | 04 /
Christman, Thomas A. 5 Maple Street Lexington, MA 02420 / UA | [2010/10] | Representative(s) | Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Frankfurter Str. 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2012/34] | Töpert, Verena Clarita, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2012/29] | Schneider, Stefan Michael, et al Braun GmbH Frankfurter Straße 145 D-61476 Kronberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/07] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/10] | Galloway, Peter David, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09015304.0 | 27.01.2004 | [2010/10] | Priority number, date | US20030364148 | 11.02.2003 Original published format: US 364148 | [2010/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2160956 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2160956 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2160956 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A46B15/00, A61C17/22, A46B9/00, A61C17/00, A46B9/02 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
A46B15/0032 (EP,US);
A46B15/00 (BR,KR);
A46B15/0002 (EP,US);
A46B9/028 (EP,US);
A61C17/22 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/10] | A46B15/00, A61C17/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2010/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zahnbürsten | [2010/10] | English: | Toothbrushes | [2010/10] | French: | Brosses à dents | [2010/10] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 13.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04705730.2 / EP1524928 | Divisional application(s) | EP10013070.7 / EP2319366 | EP10013071.5 / EP2319367 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040705730) is 02.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2016
13.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022 / US Opponent's representative Thum, Bernhard, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.10.2016
13.10.2016
ADMISSIBLE Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022 / US Opponent's representative Thum, Bernhard, et al, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | 14.11.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.06.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2018/46] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2004 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | IE | 27.01.2016 | LU | 27.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 27.01.2004 | |
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/15] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 27.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
IE | 27.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 06.01.2016 | |
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 06.01.2016 | |
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | GR | 07.04.2016 | |
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | GR | 07.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2246867 (THOMAS ARTHUR J, et al) [A] 11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5628082 (MOSKOVICH ROBERT [US]) [X] 1 * column 8, line 40 - column 9, line 27 * * column 6, lines 25-61 *; | [A]US5735011 (ASHER RANDALL S [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0126505 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 2; figure 2 *; | [I]WO0211583 (GILLETTE CANADA [CA], et al) [I] 1-4,7-10 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 10; figures 1, 4 * * page 5, lines 13-25 * * page 8, lines 5-21 *; | [XA]US6389634 (DEVLIN THOMAS E [US], et al) [X] 11-13 * column 2, lines 50-67 * * column 6, lines 47-57; figures 11-15 * [A] 14,15; | [A]GB2371217 (MCDOUGALL GREGORY J [HK]) [A] 1,10 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 13; figures 4, 5 *; | [A]US6513182 (CALABRESE GIUSEPPE [GB], et al) [A] 1-4,8,10 * column 2, lines 1-34; claims 1,2,9 * * column 3, lines 17-37 * * column 5, lines 28-31 * * column 6, lines 13-16 *; | [XP]WO03055351 (TRISA HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [XP] 14,15 * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 16; figures 4a-4e ** page 6, lines 3-11 *; | [E]EP1700537 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [E] 1-3,7 * paragraphs [0014] , [0 26] , [0 29] , [0 18]; figures 4, 7; claims 1, 4, 7, 11 * | Opposition | US2246867 | US4277862 | US5335389 | US5604951 | US5628082 | US5735011 | WO0126505 | US2001023516 | US2001039689 | WO0211583 | US6389634 | GB2371217 | US6513182 | US6571417 | WO03055351 | WO2004028235 | WO2004062519 | WO2004062573 | WO2004071237 | EP1700537 |