EP2287021 - Monitoring system for vehicles with pneumatic tyres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Richter, Siegfried Himmelreich 9 88605 Sauldorf-Rast / DE | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Neymeyer, Franz Neymeyer & Partner GbR Haselweg 20 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Neymeyer, Franz Neymeyer & Partner GbR, Haselweg 20 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09015537.5 | 16.12.2009 | [2011/08] | Priority number, date | DE20092011330U | 20.08.2009 Original published format: DE 202009011330 U | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2287021 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2287021 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04, G01G19/08 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
B60C23/04 (EP);
G01G19/086 (EP);
G01G23/3728 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/08] | B60C23/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Überwachungssystem für luftbereifte Fahrzeuge | [2011/08] | English: | Monitoring system for vehicles with pneumatic tyres | [2011/08] | French: | Système de surveillance pour véhicules à pneumatiques | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6449582 (CHAKLADER ASOKE CHANDRA DAS [CA]) [X] 1-5 * column 4 - column 12 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]JPH10267739 (NISSAN DIESEL MOTOR CO) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE10029282 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0054] * * figures 1-9 *; | [X]DE102007047399 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102007011678 | DE19856898 | DE10321235 |