22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
03.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
27.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
09.01.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
05.12.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
31.01.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
28.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
28.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.10.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.09.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
16.08.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
16.08.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
21.06.2013 |
Publication of search report |
published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
21.06.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
04.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |