EP2339683 - Flat battery cell and battery block [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ads-tec GmbH Raiffeisenstrasse 14 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | 02 /
* * * | 03 /
* * * | 04 /
* * * | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Wasmuth, Rolf, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Wasmuth, Rolf, et al Menzelstrasse 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09015786.8 | 21.12.2009 | [2011/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2339683 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2339683 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | [2011/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2339683 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04 | [2011/26] | CPC: |
H01M10/0486 (EP);
H01M50/105 (EP,US);
H01M10/613 (EP);
H01M10/647 (EP);
H01M10/656 (EP);
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H01M50/233 (EP,US);
H01M50/291 (EP,US);
H01M50/55 (EP,US);
H01M50/557 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M10/0585 (EP);
H01M10/6551 (EP);
H01M10/6562 (EP);
H01M10/6563 (EP);
H01M10/6566 (EP);
H01M10/6567 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | Akkuflachzelle und Akkublock | [2011/26] | English: | Flat battery cell and battery block | [2011/26] | French: | Cellule plate de batterie et bloc de batterie | [2011/26] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 09.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2009 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | HR | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | MK | 02.05.2012 | MT | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | SM | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | NO | 02.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | IE | 21.12.2012 | LU | 21.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | FR | 02.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/38] | HU | 21.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
SM | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
LU | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | HU | 21.12.2009 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
SM | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
LU | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
SM | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
LU | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
FR | 02.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
HR | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
NO | 02.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | |
NO | 02.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29917812U (HOEFLIGER HARRO VERPACKUNG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US6145280 (DAROUX MARK L [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]WO0197299 (ELION AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 21ff; figures 1, 2 * |