EP2202058 - Composite material and method for preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2021 | Revocation of patent | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel-Evonik Ltd. 2-18-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8230 / JP | [2010/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikuta, Toru 5-6-23, Nishimoto Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658-0073 / JP | 02 /
Mutsuda, Mitsuteru 6-11, Nagamachi 2-chome Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1125 / JP | 03 /
Komada, Hajime 7-7-37, Tsujii Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0083 / JP | [2014/37] |
Former [2010/26] | 01 /
Ikuta, Toru 5-6-23, Nishimoto Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 658-0073 / JP | ||
02 /
Mutsuda, Mitsuteru 6-11, Nagamachi 2-chome Hirohata-ku Himeji-shi Hyogo 671-1125 / JP | |||
03 /
Komada, Hajime 7-7-37, Tsujii Himeji-shi Hyogo 670-0083 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09015803.1 | 09.01.2002 | [2010/26] | Priority number, date | JP20010006767 | 15.01.2001 Original published format: JP 2001006767 | [2010/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2202058 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2202058 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | [2011/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2202058 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/08, B32B25/08 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/20 (US);
B32B27/285 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B27/40 (US);
C08J5/121 (EP,US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2375/00 (US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31554 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31562 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31565 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31569 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31576 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3158 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31587 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31594 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31598 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31728 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31732 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31739 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31743 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31746 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3175 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31757 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31761 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31786 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31833 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31859 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31862 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3187 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31931 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2010/26] | Title | German: | Verbundstoffmaterial und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2010/26] | English: | Composite material and method for preparation thereof | [2010/26] | French: | Matériau composite et son procédé de préparation | [2010/26] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2014 | Observations by third parties | 28.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02715710.6 / EP1273433 | Divisional application(s) | EP14003094.1 / EP2813534 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020715710) is 16.05.2003 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2015/29] | 15.07.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.02.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.08.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.09.2021 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2021/51] | 08.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 05.10.2017 | Appeal received No. T2275/17 | 11.12.2017 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.09.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 08.11.2021 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 07.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0422392 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5122420 (BARON CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5132182 (GROSSE-PUPPENDAHL THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US5484848 (JADAMUS HANS [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10 * the whole document * * example -; table - * * Examples C1,C5,C6,C10 and C11 with moulding compositions C and D *; column 3, line 30 - column 8, line 18; tables 1,2 *; | [A]US5962146 (BETREMIEUX ISABELLE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 30 - column 6, line 41; example - * | by applicant | JPS5025682 | JPS61204260 | JPH02150439 | JPH03133631 | JPH03138114 | JPH05301973 | JPH0711013 | JPH07166043 | JPH07304880 | JPH08156188 | JPH09124803 | JPH1058605 | other | - MITSUTERU MUTSUDA, HAJIME KOMADA, "DIRECT BONDING BETWEEN POLY(OXY-2,6-DIMETHYL-1,4-PHENYLENE) AND RUBBER WITH RADICALS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (20040414), vol. 95, doi:10.1002/APP.20803, pages 53 - 59, XP003034141 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/APP.20803 |