EP2052760 - An extinguishing head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telesto Sp. z o.o. ul. Ludwinowska 17 02-856 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Telesto Sp. Z O. O. Ul. Ludwinowska 17 PL-02-856 Warszawa / PL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duda, Ludomir ul. Polna 15 05-506 Magdalenka / PL | 02 /
Tarnogrodzki, Antoni Al. Wilanowska 364 m 72 02-665 Warszawa / PL | 03 /
Lada, Zygmunt ul. Modrzewiowa 15 05-550 Nowa Iwiczna / PL | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Woznicki, Jerzy ul. Nowowiejska 1/3 lok. 9 00-643 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | Woznicki, Jerzy Patent Attorney Al. Niepodleglosci 222 kl. A lok. 20 00-663 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 09075039.9 | 29.05.2006 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | PL20050375521 | 05.06.2005 Original published format: PL 37552105 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2052760 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2052760 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | [2009/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052760 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A62C31/07 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
A62C31/07 (EP,KR,US);
A62C5/02 (KR);
A62C27/00 (KR);
A62C31/02 (KR);
A62C99/0072 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | A62C5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Title | German: | Löschkopf | [2009/18] | English: | An extinguishing head | [2009/18] | French: | Tête d'extinction | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 12.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06757913.6 / EP1893304 | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | BE | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | HU | 15.09.2010 | IT | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | NL | 15.09.2010 | PL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | ES | 26.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | IE | 29.05.2011 | LU | 29.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 29.05.2011 | ||
LU | 29.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 29.05.2011 | ||
LU | 29.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 29.05.2011 | ||
LU | 29.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
IE | 29.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2612405 (EMIL KIRSCHBAUM) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29510976U (BROEMME ALBRECHT DIPL ING [DE]) [A] * figure 2 * | by applicant | PL188681B | PL368269 |