EP2170009 - Power save enhancements for W- LANs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2010/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Surineni, Shravan K., @ Qualcomm, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Meylan, Arnaud, @ Qualcomm, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
Dassu, Ajay, @ Qualcomm, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2016/24] |
Former [2010/13] | 01 /
Surineni, Shravan K., Qualcomm, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
02 /
Meylan, Arnaud, Qualcomm, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
03 /
Dassu, Ajay, Qualcomm, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2010/13] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09075454.0 | 16.10.2007 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | US20060862146P | 19.10.2006 Original published format: US 862146 P | US20070871874 | 12.10.2007 Original published format: US 871874 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2170009 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2170009 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, // H04W88/02 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H04W52/0225 (EP,BR,NO,US);
H04W52/02 (KR);
H04W88/02 (EP,BR,NO,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | H04W76/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2010/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Erweiterungen zum Energiesparen für W-LANs | [2010/13] | English: | Power save enhancements for W- LANs | [2010/13] | French: | Améliorations d'économie d'énergie pour W-LANs | [2016/01] |
Former [2010/13] | Améliorations d'économie d'énergie pour W-LANsl | Examination procedure | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 23.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07874437.2 / EP2080331 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070874437) is 16.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Request for further processing for: | 06.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 06.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.04.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2007 | AT | 15.06.2016 | BE | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | ES | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | IT | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | IE | 16.10.2016 | LU | 16.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 16.10.2007 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 16.10.2007 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.10.2007 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.10.2007 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
IE | 16.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
LU | 16.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
IT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005136833 (EMEOTT STEPHEN P [US], et al) [X] 1,3-14 * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 2; | [XAY]US2005213534 (BENVENISTE MATHILDE [US]) [X] 1,6,9,12-13 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0006] , [0054] , [0057]; claim 1 * [A] 3-5,7-8,10-11,14 [Y] 2; | [XA]US2005288070 (OMORI YOUKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,9,12-13 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] * * claim 1 *[A] 2-5,7-8,10-11,14 | by applicant | US2005136833 |