EP2079087 - Assembly with at least one electrical coil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2010 [2010/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mdexx Gmbh Richard-Dunkel-Strasse 120 28199 Bremen / DE | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meinke, Stefan Thorner Str. 18 27755, Delmenhorst / DE | 02 /
Bröske, Marc Grosser-Kamp-Str. 45 27374, Visselhövede / DE | 03 /
Niemann, Marco Schliemannstr. 22 27749, Delmenhorst / DE | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Am Kaffee-Quartier 3 28217 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09150099.1 | 06.01.2009 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | DE20081004342 | 09.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008004342 | [2009/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2079087 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/18, F28D15/02 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
H01F27/18 (EP);
F28D15/0266 (EP);
F28D15/0275 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/12] |
Former [2009/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung mit mindestens einer elektrischen Wicklung | [2009/29] | English: | Assembly with at least one electrical coil | [2009/29] | French: | Agencement doté d'au moins un enroulement électrique | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/30] | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60163412 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [DX]EP1641003 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [DX] 1-9 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0031] , [0033]; figures 2,3,5,6,13 *; | [X]US2007247266 (YARGOLE ARUN D [IN], et al) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0030]; figures 3,6 *; | [X]JPS5717116 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]US3541487 (LEONARD MERRILL G) [A] 9 * column 3, lines 63,64 * * column 4, lines 9-30; figure 3 *; | [A]WO02102124 (LIEBERT CORP [US]) [A] 9 * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 28; figure 7 * | by applicant | WO9631888 | EP1641003 |