EP2080530 - Chest drainage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurosets S.r.l. Strada Statale 12, 143 41036 Medolla (MO) / IT | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fontanili, Paolo Via Dei Ciliegi, 43 42015, CORREGGIO RE / IT | 02 /
Paratelli, Ruggero Via Matteotti, 43/c 41036, MEDOLLA MO / IT | 03 /
Balugani, Fabio Via Verdi, 31 41032, CAVEZZO MO / IT | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
Fontanili, Paolo Via Dei Ciliegi, 43 42015, CORREGGIO RE / IT | ||
02 /
Parartelli, Ruggero Via Matteotti, 43/c 41036, MEDOLLA MO / IT | |||
03 /
Balugani, Fabio Via Verdi, 31 41032, CAVEZZO MO / IT | Representative(s) | Zoli, Filippo, et al Brunacci & Partners S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/25] | Zoli, Filippo, et al Brunacci & Partners S.r.l. Via Giardini, 625 41125 Modena / IT | ||
Former [2009/30] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09150196.5 | 08.01.2009 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | IT2008MI00076 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: IT MI20080076 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080530 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080530 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
A61M1/61 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/13] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Thoraxdrainagevorrichtung | [2009/30] | English: | Chest drainage device | [2009/30] | French: | Dispositif de drainage thoracique | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 02.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2004055639 (FONTANILI PAOLO [IT], et al) [AD] 1-8 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 38 * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]US4210174 (EROSS BELA [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 28-39 * * figures 2-5 *; | [A]US3847152 (SCHACHET E) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 41-48 * * figures 2,4-6 *; | [A]GB2166055 (BIORESEARCH INC) [A] 1 * page 6, lines 45-110 * * figure 3 * | by applicant | US6959722 | IT1322324 |