EP2093524 - Device for mounting solar modules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2009/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIGGERS, Melanie Salzufler Str. 61 32657, Lemgo / DE | 02 /
HÖCKER, Eitel-Friedrich Horstkotterheide 18 33739, Bielefeld / DE | 03 /
HANKE, Carsten Bremer Str. 58 33613, Bielefeld / DE | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 09150287.2 | 09.01.2009 | [2009/35] | Priority number, date | DE20082002346U | 19.02.2008 Original published format: DE 202008002346 U | [2009/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093524 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/52, H01L31/042, H01L31/048 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H02S20/23 (EP);
F24S25/33 (EP);
F24S25/613 (EP);
F24S25/70 (EP);
F24S2025/6004 (EP);
F24S2025/6007 (EP);
F28F2275/16 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Montage von Solarmodulen | [2009/35] | English: | Device for mounting solar modules | [2009/35] | French: | Dispositif destiné au montage de modules solaires | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE20204148U (SCHUECO INT KG [DE]) [DY] 1,10,11 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 10; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE20304099U (FLECK OSKAR [DE]) [Y] 1,10,11 * page 9, line 9 - line 16; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102004026786 (OSMER KLAUS-DIETER [DE]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0047]; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP1887294 (APLICACIONES PLACAS SOLARES S [ES]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0023]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0890688 (BINKERT HUGO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 39; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10132557 (ANTEC SOLAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1-10 *; | [A]DE29818738U (FLECK OSKAR [DE]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 26; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE102005058065 (CITAK FATMA [DE]) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1-11 *; | [A]DE102005032859 (ULRICH SIEGFRIED [DE], et al) [A] * paragraph [0037]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE20204148U |