EP2078660 - sulky [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Claude FLORES Bureau d'Etudes 28 rue Victor Hugo 38150 Roussillon / FR | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flores, Claude 28 rue Victor Hugo 38150 Roussillon / FR | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12 rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 09150323.5 | 09.01.2009 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | FR20080000141 | 10.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0800141 | [2009/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078660 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078660 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62C1/08 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
B62C1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | Sulky | [2009/29] | English: | sulky | [2009/29] | French: | sulky | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/06] | 16.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2010 | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | DK | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | FI | 04.08.2010 | HR | 04.08.2010 | HU | 04.08.2010 | IE | 04.08.2010 | IT | 04.08.2010 | LT | 04.08.2010 | LV | 04.08.2010 | MK | 04.08.2010 | MT | 04.08.2010 | NL | 04.08.2010 | PL | 04.08.2010 | PT | 04.08.2010 | RO | 04.08.2010 | SE | 04.08.2010 | SI | 04.08.2010 | SK | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | NO | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | ES | 15.11.2010 | IS | 04.12.2010 | LU | 09.01.2011 | BE | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MK | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PT | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
TR | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
LU | 09.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MK | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PT | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
LU | 09.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MK | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
LU | 09.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MK | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
MT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
ES | 15.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
HR | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
IT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
NO | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2525536 (SUNDBERG STIG [SE]) [A] 1-9 * page 8, line 8 - line 28 ** page 9, line 1 - line 26; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2768984 (THIBAULT ESSIEUX RTN SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2005023784 (HARMER THOMAS GLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048]; figure 1 * |