EP2078945 - Method and device for analysing and evaluating measurement data of a measurement system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL List GmbH Hans-List-Platz 1 8020 Graz / AT | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritz, Sven Christian Gregor-Schwake-Strasse 2 88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
Guntschnig, Thomas Mariagrünerstraße 4 8043 Graz / AT | 03 /
Stettner, Martin Sparbersbachgasse 49 8010 Graz / AT | 04 /
Berger, Marvin Berggasse 8 8670 Krieglach / AT | 05 /
Fuchs, Werner Unterassling 72 9911 Assling / AT | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/29] | 01 /
Fritz, Sven Christian Gregor-Schwake-Strasse 2 88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
02 /
Guntschnig, Thomas Mariagrünerstraße 4 8043 Graz / AT | |||
03 /
Stettner, Martin Sparbersbachgasse 49 8010 Graz / AT | |||
04 /
Berger, Marvin Berggasse 8 8670 Krieglach / AT | |||
05 /
Fuchs, Werner Unterassling 72 9911 Assling / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Pinter & Weiss OG Prinz-Eugen-Straße 70 1040 Wien / AT | [2014/42] |
Former [2012/44] | Pinter, Rudolf, et al Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2009/29] | Laminger, Norbert, et al Pinter, Laminger & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 09150458.9 | 13.01.2009 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | AT20080000022U | 14.01.2008 Original published format: AT 2208 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2009/29] | AT20080002220U | 14.01.2008 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2078945 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2078945 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01M15/05, G01D3/08, G01D21/00 | [2016/33] | CPC: |
G01M15/06 (EP,US);
G01D21/00 (EP,US);
G01D3/08 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/29] | G01M15/05 | Designated contracting states | [2017/17] |
Former [2009/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Analyse und Bewertung von Messdaten eines Messsystems | [2009/29] | English: | Method and device for analysing and evaluating measurement data of a measurement system | [2009/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'analyse et d'évaluation de données de mesure d'un système de mesure | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/33] | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5491631 (SHIRANE YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * figure - * * claim - ** abstract *; | [XI]WO0010059 (ASPEN TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * figure - * * claim - * [I] 3-10,13-18; | [A]US6574613 (MORENO-BARRAGAN JORGE [DE]) [A] 1-18 * claim - * * figure - *; | [AD]DE102006048730 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [AD] 1-18 * figure - * * claim - * | by applicant | DE102006048730 | - FRANK KIMMICH: "Modellbasierte Fehlererkennung und Diagnose der Einspritzung und Verbrennung von Dieselmotoren", DISSERTATION, 2003 | - FÜHRER ET AL.: "Erkennung von Zündaussetzern aus Dreh zahlsignalen mit Hilfe eines Frequenzbereichsverfahrens", TAGUNG ELEKTRONIK IM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | - M. WILLIMOWSKI; SHAKER VERLAG; AACHEN, VERBRENNUNGSDIAGNOSE VON OTTOMOTOREN MITTELS ABGASDRUCK UND ZONENSTROM | - R. N. CLARK; D.C. FOSTH; V.M. WALTON: "Detection of instrument malfunctions in control systems", EEE TRANSACTIONS ON AUTOMATIC CONTROL, 1984 | - T. PFEUFER: "Fortschrittberichte VDI", vol. 8, 1999, VDI-VERLAG., article "Modellgestützte Fehlererkennung und Diagnose am Beispiel eines Kraftahrzeugaktors" | - S. LEONHARDT: "Forschungsberichte, VDI", 1996, VDI-VERLAG DÜSSELDORF, article "Modellgestützte Fehlererkennung mit Neuronalen Netzen - Überwachung von Radaufhängungen und Diesel-Einspritzanlagen" | - SVEN FRITZ: "Entwicklung und Verifizierung eines neuronalen Netzwerkmodells zur Beschreibung des Verhaltens von PKW-Partikelfiltersystemen in Bezug auf Beladung und Regeneration", DIPLOMARBEIT, 2002 | - CHRISTIAN LANDGRAF: "Entwicklung und Applikation eines virtuellen Sensors zur Bestimmung der Beladung von Partikelfiltern", DISSERTATION, 2005 | - TIMO COMBE: "Motorsimulation in Echtzeit", DISSERTATION, 2006 | - G. HOHENBERG: "Visionen zu einem Motorenprüfstand für das 21. Jahrhundert", HAUS DER TECHNIK, 1999 | - THOMAS P. RYAN: "Statistical Methods for Quality Improvement", 2000, WILEY & SON INC | - SCHÖNE: "Neue Entwicklungen der statistischen Prozesskontrolle bei korrelierten Daten", DISSERTATION, 1997 | - R. JOHNSON; M. BAGSHAW: "The effect of serial correlation on the performance of CUSUM tests", TECHNOMETRICS | - P. BERTHOUEX ET AL.: "The use of stochastic models in the interpretation of historical data from sewage treatment plants", WATER RESEARCH, vol. 10, pages 1976 | - "Modification of control chart limits in the presence of data correlation", JOURNAL OF QUALITY TECHNOLOGY, 1978 | - P. BERTHOUEX; W. HUNTER; L. PALLESENU: "Monitoring sewage treatment plants: Some quality aspects", JOURNAL OF QUALITY TECHNOLOGY, vol. 10, 1978, pages 4 | - L. ALWAN; H. ROBERTS: "Time series modelling for statistical process control", JOURNAL OF BUSINESS AND ECONOMIC STATISTICS, vol. 6, 1988 | - "Statistical Process Control in Automated Manufacturing", 1998, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., article "A multivariate and stochastic framework for statistical process control" | - T. HARRIS; W. ROSS: "Statistical process control procedures for correlated observations", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERING, 1991 | - D. MONTGOMERY: "Introduction to Statistical Quality Control", JOHN WILEY & SONS | - D. MONTGOMERY; C. MASTRANGELO: "Some statistical process control methods for autocorrelated data", JOURNAL OF QUALITY TECHNOLOGY, 1991 | - W. WOODALL; F. FALTIN: "Autocorrelated data and SPC", ASQC STATISTICAL DIVISION NEWSLETTER, 1994 | - THOMAS P. RYAN: "Statistical Methods for Quality Improvement", 2000, WILEY & SON INC, article "Statistical Methods for Quality Improvement" | - A. ZELL: "Simulation neuronaler Netze", 1994, ADDISON WESLEY LONGMANN VERLAG, article "Entwicklung und Verifizierung eines dynamischen Beobachtersystems für Motorenprüfstände" | - E. MARONOVA, BACHELORARBEIT, 2006 | - TOMA DONCHEV: "Adaptiv-Resonanz-Theorie und Entwicklung eines dynamischen Beobachtersystem zur Motor-Diagnose", BACHELORARBEIT, 2007 | DE20051052921 |