EP2080679 - Device for wiping an automobile window with wiping zones with different wiping frequencies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles Société Anonyme Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles Société Anonyme Route de Gisy 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barron, Gilles 40 rue du Général de Gaulle 25420, Bart / FR | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel PSA Automobiles SA VEIP - VV1400 Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Vigand, Régis Louis Michel PSA Peugeot Citroën Propriété Industrielle (LG081) 18, Rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 09150603.0 | 15.01.2009 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | FR20080050334 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0850334 | [2009/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080679 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
B60S1/08 (EP);
B60S1/0896 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Reinigung von Kraftfahrzeugfenstern mit Reinigungszonen, die unterschiedliche Wischfrequenzen haben | [2009/30] | English: | Device for wiping an automobile window with wiping zones with different wiping frequencies | [2009/30] | French: | Dispositif d'essuyage d'une glace de véhicule automobile à zones d'essuyage de fréquences de balayage différentes | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/08] | 15.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXA]EP0484292 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]) [DX] 9 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 47; figure - * [A] 1-3; | [DXA]US4934014 (YAMAMOTO TOKIHIKO [JP]) [DX] 9 * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 25; figure - * [A] 1,6,7; | [XA]US5826295 (ELMHIRST JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 9 * column 2, line 43 - line 51; figure - * * column 3, line 11 - line 55; claim 2 * [A] 1-5,8; | [XA]US5506483 (MCCANN ROY A [US], et al) [X] 9 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 4; figure - * [A] 1-5 | by applicant | US4934014 | EP0484292 |