EP2209128 - Gapped magnet core [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Research Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2010/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anger, Jan Plommonstigen 25 771 43, Ludvika / SE | 02 /
Forslin, Julia Högbergsgatan 66A 771 35, Ludvika / SE | 03 /
Gäfvert, Uno Sportfiskargatan 49 723 49, Västerås / SE | [2015/10] |
Former [2010/29] | 01 /
Anger, Jan Plommonstigen 25 771 43, Ludvika / SE | ||
02 /
Forslin, Julia Högbergsgatan 66A 771 35, Ludvika / SE | |||
03 /
Gäfvert, Uno Sportfiskargatan 49 723 49, Västerås / SE | Representative(s) | Kock, Ina ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | [2015/10] |
Former [2010/29] | Kock, Ina ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 09150901.8 | 20.01.2009 | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2209128 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2209128 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/08, H01F37/00, H01F3/14, H01F27/26, H01F41/02 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
H01F3/14 (EP,US);
H01F27/263 (EP,US);
H01F41/0206 (EP,US);
H01F27/08 (EP,US);
H01F37/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49075 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | H01F3/14, H01F27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/29] | Title | German: | Magnetjoch mit Spalten | [2010/29] | English: | Gapped magnet core | [2010/29] | French: | Culasse magnétique avec entrefers | [2010/29] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2010/29] | 19.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2009 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | ES | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MK | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.01.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.01.2009 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MK | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | BE | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | BE | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 04.03.2015 | |
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 04.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1571057 (SEV MARCHAL) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0075164 (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2002024413 (DE GRAAF MARTINUS JOHANNES MAR [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | Examination | US2006091989 | by applicant | CA1034646 | JPS58128709 |