EP2088029 - Device for loading and unloading of a container on a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guima Palfinger 29A, Avenue des Tourondes 82300 Caussade / FR | [2009/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lagorce, Mathieu 16 Chemin d'Augé 82300, MONTEILS / FR | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Branger, Jean-Yves, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, Rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | Branger, Jean-Yves, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09150925.7 | 20.01.2009 | [2009/33] | Priority number, date | FR20080050789 | 07.02.2008 Original published format: FR 0850789 | [2009/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2088029 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/64, B60P1/48 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
B60P1/6463 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Beladung und Entladung eines Kontainerfahrzeugs | [2009/33] | English: | Device for loading and unloading of a container on a vehicle | [2009/33] | French: | Dispositif de manutention pour le chargement et le déchargement d'un conteneur | [2009/33] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 26.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 16.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/52] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0012145 (GRUELLES MAURICE); | [DA]FR2451841 (GUIMA); | [A]DE3312557 (GERGEN ENGELBERT [DE], et al); | [A]EP0537719 (MALZANINI ALBERTO [IT]); | [A]EP1155905 (MULTILIFT OY [FI]); | [A]US2002127087 (BOHATA JOHN F [US]) | by applicant | FR2451841 | FR2523047 |