EP2083413 - Plasma display device and method of driving a plasma display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yeo, Jae-Young c/o Legal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09151151.9 | 22.01.2009 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | KR20080007592 | 24.01.2008 Original published format: KR 20080007592 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083413 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/288 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
G09G3/288 (EP,US);
G09G3/291 (KR);
G09G3/296 (KR);
G09G2330/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigetafel und Verfahren zur Ansteuerung einer Plasmaanzeigetafel | [2009/31] | English: | Plasma display device and method of driving a plasma display panel | [2009/31] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à plasma et procédé de pilotage d'un écran d'affichage à plasma | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 06.11.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001024179 (NAKAMURA TADASHI [JP]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002196225 (FUKUDA MASAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1612831 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-7,10,11 * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0081]; figures 5,6 *; | [X]EP1657703 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-6,10,11 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0042] * |