EP2082653 - Lingerie article and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhovyl 55310 Tronville en Barrois / FR | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grand, Anne-Marie 10 bis rue des Communautés 71450, BLANZY / FR | 02 /
Regad, Alain 133 rue Saint-Dizier 54000, NANCY / FR | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Cardy, Sophie Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Cardy, Sophie Marie, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09151170.9 | 23.01.2009 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | FR20080050438 | 24.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0850438 | [2009/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2082653 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A41B9/04, A41F11/00, D04B1/24 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
A41B9/04 (EP);
A41F11/00 (EP);
D04B1/243 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | Unterwäsche und ihr Herstellungsverfahren | [2009/31] | English: | Lingerie article and method of making same | [2009/31] | French: | Article de lingerie et son procédé de fabrication | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 25.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 11.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3678514 (SAFRIT SAM C) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3709669 (MUELLER KARL HEINZ, et al) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2134219 (TRIUMPH INTERNATIONAL AG) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1493120 (ANDRE SILVAIN & CIE SA ETS) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2195978 (BILLI SPA [IT]) [A] 7 * the whole document *; | [DA]GB634618 (FELTZ AND COMPANY LTD J, et al); | [A]FR1020090 (S E M E P SOC) | by applicant | GB1130473 | GB634618 |