EP2117267 - Methods, test systems and arrangements for verifying compliance with requirement specifications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattisson, Leif / Skogsvägen 20 A SE-241 37, Södra Sandby / SE | 02 /
Rathonyi, Béla / Östra Almgatan 77 SE-234 37, Lomma / SE | [2012/28] |
Former [2009/46] | 01 /
Mattisson, Leif Skogsvägen 20 A SE-241 37, Södra Sandby / SE | ||
02 /
Rathonyi, Béla Östra Almgatan 77 SE-234 37, Lomma / SE | Representative(s) | Akerman, Mårten Lennart Ericsson AB Patent Unit Mobile Platforms 221 83 Lund / SE | [2012/27] |
Former [2009/46] | Andersson, Björn E. Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 793 220 07 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 09151172.5 | 23.01.2009 | [2009/46] | Priority number, date | US20080051117P | 07.05.2008 Original published format: US 51117 P | US20080061179P | 13.06.2008 Original published format: US 61179 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117267 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2117267 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/00, H04L12/26 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
H04W24/06 (EP,US);
H04L1/243 (US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L43/50 (EP,US);
H04W36/0005 (EP,US);
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren, Prüfsysteme und Anordnungen zur Prüfung der Erfüllung von Anforderungsspezifikationen | [2009/46] | English: | Methods, test systems and arrangements for verifying compliance with requirement specifications | [2009/46] | French: | Procédés, systèmes d'essai et agencements pour vérifier la conformité à des spécifications requises | [2009/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 08.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.07.2012 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | HR | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | MK | 11.07.2012 | MT | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | NO | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | IE | 23.01.2013 | LU | 23.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MK | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
CY | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 11.07.2012 | |
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9843455 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * page 2, line 28 - page 4, line 21 * * page 6, line 19 - page 10, line 19 * * page 14, line 4 - page 17, line 19 * * figures 1-5,7 *; | [X]WO0051380 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [DA] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Terminal logical test interface; Special conformance testing functions (3GPP TS 34.109 version 6.2.0 Release 6); ETSI TS 134 109", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20060901), vol. 3-R2;3-T1, no. V6.2.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014035749 [DA] 1-21 * the whole document * |