EP2083558 - Mobile phone, method of switching a mobile phone and use of a mobile phone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SiTel Semiconductor B.V. Het Zuiderkruis 53 5215 MV 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kruiskamp, Marinus Wilhelmus De Savornin Lohmanstraat 5 5237 CB 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09151341.6 | 26.01.2009 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | WO2008NL50045 | 25.01.2008 Original published format: PCT/NL2008/050045 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083558 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/60, H04R5/033 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
H04M1/605 (EP);
H04R1/02 (EP);
H04R2499/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/14] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobiltelefon, Verfahren zum Umschalten eines Mobiltelefons und Verwendung eines Mobiltelefons | [2009/31] | English: | Mobile phone, method of switching a mobile phone and use of a mobile phone | [2009/31] | French: | Téléphone mobile, procédé de commutation d'un téléphone mobile et son utilisation | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 26.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005136848 (MURRAY MATT [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0042] *; | [X]EP1855507 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0042]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056]; figure 6 * | by applicant | US2005136848 | EP0185550 |