Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
30.10.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
14.05.2012 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
28.01.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.02.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.03.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
29.01.2010 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
15.01.2010 | First examination report | |
13.01.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.01.2010 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
10.07.2009 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |