EP2123855 - Interlocking mechanism for sliding rails [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co., Ltd. No. 2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town, Bao'an District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518109 / CN | For all designated states Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. 66 Chung Shan Road Tu-cheng City, Taipei Hsien / TW | [2014/25] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co. Ltd. N°. 2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town, Bao'an District Shenzhen City Guangdong 518109 / CN | ||
For all designated states Hon Hai Precision Industry Co., Ltd. 66 Chung Shan Road Tu-cheng City, Taipei Hsien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yu, Mo-Ming c/o Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co.,Ltd No.2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town, Bao'an District ShenZhen City Guangdong 518109 / CN | 02 /
He, Xiang-Wei c/o Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co.,Ltd No.2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town, Bao'an District ShenZhen City Guangdong 518109 / CN | [2014/25] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
Yu, Mo-Ming c/o Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co.,Ltd No.2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town Bao'an District ShenZhen City Guangdong 518109 / CN | ||
02 /
He, Xiang-Wei c/o Hong Fu Jin Precision Industry (ShenZhen) Co.,Ltd No.2, 2nd Donghuan Road Longhua Town Bao'an District ShenZhen City Guoangodong 518109 / CN | Representative(s) | Stuttard, Garry Philip Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/20] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2014/14] | Radkov, Stoyan Atanassov, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium 1 Eversholt Street London NW1 2DN / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Craven, Ian, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09151394.5 | 27.01.2009 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | CN200810301701 | 21.05.2008 Original published format: CN200810301701 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2123855 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2123855 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2123855 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/46 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
E05B65/463 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2013/31] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eingriffsmechanismus für Schienen | [2009/48] | English: | Interlocking mechanism for sliding rails | [2009/48] | French: | Mécanisme d'inter-verrouillage pour rails de glissement | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 03.07.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.08.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 27.01.2015 | FR | 02.02.2015 | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/48] | GB | 27.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3323849 (STARK FOREST G) [A] 1-7,14 * column 1, line 60 - column 3, line 75; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE1429493 (BREUNINGER & GROEZINGER GMBH) [A] 1,6,14 * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2063355 (SCHAEFER GMBH FRITZ) [A] 1,4-8,14 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 29; figures 1-5 *; | [A]FR2269889 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-4,14 * page 2, line 30 - page 6, line 10; figures 1-6 *; | [A]FR2158745 (RHODANIENS ATEL) [A] 1,4,14 * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 25; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | GB2063355 |