EP2085299 - Articulated vehicle stabilization system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Eric Richard 9540 W. Buckhill Galena, IL 61036 / US | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Dehnhardt, Florian Christopher John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Dehnhardt, Florian Christopher Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09151719.3 | 30.01.2009 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | US20080025555P | 01.02.2008 Original published format: US 25555 P | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2085299 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2085299 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B62D53/02, B60G17/005, B62D12/00 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
B60G17/005 (EP,US);
B62D12/00 (EP,US);
B62D53/021 (EP,US);
B62D53/023 (EP,US);
B60G2200/318 (EP,US);
B60G2300/0262 (EP,US);
B60G2400/40 (EP,US);
B60G2800/0124 (EP,US);
B60G2800/0194 (EP,US);
B60G2800/9124 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/32] | B62D53/02, B60G17/005 | Designated contracting states | IT, NO, SE [2014/09] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stabilisierungssystem für Gelenkfahrzeug | [2009/32] | English: | Articulated vehicle stabilization system | [2009/32] | French: | Système de stabilisation de véhicule articulé | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 04.01.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2007013990 (DEERE & CO, et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-11 * page 3, line 26 - page 7, line 25; figures 1-7 * [A] 2,3,6; | [A]WO2005030563 (TECHNOLOGY INVESTMENTS LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 16, lines 5-22; figure 19 *; | [A]WO03036125 (LIQUIDSPRING TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 2,3,6 * page 28, line 27 - page 29, line 24; figure 17 *; | [A]WO0247926 (BOLER CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0042]; figure 3 *; | [A]US3414072 (HODGES JR WETMORE, et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 3,4 * | by applicant | WO2007013990 |