EP2085368 - Joint mortar especially for shaped clinker bricks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPOL Gips Sp. z o.o. Fidor 26-200 Konskie / PL | [2009/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Czesak, Zofia os. Sosnówka 3/3 26-060 Checiny / PL | 02 /
Gumulka, Wladyslaw ul. Szwedzka 4/21/22 25-113 Kielce / PL | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Fietko-Basa, Sylwia Kancelaria Patentowa Grazyna Basa Ul. Jagiellonska 59 25-734 Kielce / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | Fietko-Basa, Sylwia Kancelaria Patentowa Grazyna Basa Ul. Jagiellonska 59 25-734 Kielce / PL | Application number, filing date | 09151835.7 | 31.01.2009 | [2009/32] | Priority number, date | PL20080384366 | 01.02.2008 Original published format: PL 38436608 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2085368 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2085368 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04, // C04B14/06, C04B14/28, C04B24/38 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B2111/00672 (EP);
C04B2111/21 (EP);
C04B2111/802 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B14/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/14, C04B14/42, C04B18/08, C04B18/24, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B22/064, C04B24/2676, C04B24/383, C04B24/383, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/10, C04B2103/20, C04B2103/32, C04B2103/54, C04B2103/65 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/14, C04B16/0633, C04B18/08, C04B18/141, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B22/064, C04B24/2641, C04B24/383, C04B24/383, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/10, C04B2103/20, C04B2103/32, C04B2103/54, C04B2103/65 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/14, C04B16/0691, C04B18/08, C04B18/141, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B22/064, C04B24/2641, C04B24/383, C04B24/383, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/10, C04B2103/20, C04B2103/32, C04B2103/54, C04B2103/65 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/04, C04B14/06, C04B14/14, C04B18/08, C04B18/141, C04B18/24, C04B20/0076, C04B20/008, C04B22/064, C04B24/2641, C04B24/383, C04B24/383, C04B40/0608, C04B2103/10, C04B2103/20, C04B2103/32, C04B2103/54, C04B2103/65 (EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/37] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fugenmörtel für geformte Ziegelklinker | [2009/32] | English: | Joint mortar especially for shaped clinker bricks | [2009/32] | French: | Mortier de jointoiement pour des briques dures | [2009/32] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 13.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003056696 (FENSKE JOHN W [US], et al) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0030] , [0035] , [0051] - [0054]; claim - *; | [I]WO2005097699 (BARBER ROBERT FREDERICK [AU]) [I] 1-3 * page 2, lines 10-29; example 1; claim - *; | [A]EP1609770 (PCI AUGSBURG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0014] - [0033] *; | [E]EP2228352 (ALPOL GIPS SP Z O O [PL]) [E] 1-3 * the whole document * |