22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
26.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
03.01.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
13.12.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
08.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
25.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] |
06.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
30.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
16.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2013 [2013/38] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
25.01.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] |
18.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.06.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.08.2012 [2012/31] |
06.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2012 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] |
20.01.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
10.06.2011 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
10.06.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
10.06.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
02.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.07.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] |