EP2088121 - Transportable unit for creating ozone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Change - priority | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states "Oxy 3" Egger KG Schiffgasse 8 8600 Bruck an der Mur / AT | [2010/14] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states "Oxy 3" Egger KEG Schiffgasse 8 8600 Bruck an der Mur / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Egger, Andreas Schiffgasse 8 8600 Bruck an der Mur / AT | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Vinazzer, Edith Schönburgstrasse 11/7 1040 Wien / AT | [2009/33] | Application number, filing date | 09152302.7 | 06.02.2009 | [2009/33] | Priority number, date | AT20080000076U | 08.02.2008 Original published format: AT 7608 U | [2013/10] |
Former [2009/33] | AT20080007620U | 08.02.2008 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2088121 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/10, C01B13/11 | [2009/33] | CPC: |
C01B13/10 (EP);
C01B13/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | Transportable Einheit zur Erzeugung von Ozon | [2009/33] | English: | Transportable unit for creating ozone | [2009/33] | French: | Unité transportable pour la production d'ozone | [2009/33] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 07.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2054367 (EDMONDO FISCH) [X] 1-3,7-11 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 23; figure 1 * [Y] 4,12,13; | [Y]US2004256302 (MARQUIS GILLES [CA], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0033] , [0037]; claims 1,6 *; | [Y]WO9948807 (EDEN AIR INC [US]) [Y] 12,13 * claims 1,31,37 *; | [A]DE3409268 (ERWIN SANDER ELEKTROAPPARATEBA [DE]) [A] 1-14 * page 5; claims 1-4 *; | [A]GB1034367 (THOMAS ANDRE) [A] 1-14 * page 2, lines 51-67; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO9403217 | WO9810774 | EP0970916 | WO9701507 | WO2004046028 | GB2403213 | US2004136884 | CN101001807 | WO2007014474 | EP0103144 |