EP2098936 - Method and system for coordinated vehicle control with wireless communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Italia S.p.A. Via Plava 80 10135 Torino / IT | [2011/08] |
Former [2011/04] | For all designated states CNH Italia S.p.A. Via Plava 80 10135 Turin / IT | ||
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states CNH Italia S.p.A. Viale delle Nazioni, 55 41100 Modena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morselli, Ricccardo Via Medicine 183/i San Vito di Spilamberto 41057 Modena / IT | 02 /
Posselius, John H. 360 Rose Hill Road Ephrata, PA 17522 / US | [2011/35] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
Morselli, Ricccardo Via Medicine 183/i San Vito di Spilamberto 41057 Modena / IT | ||
02 /
Posselius, John H. 360 Rose Hill Road Ephrata, PA 17522 / US | Representative(s) | CNH Industrial IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/35] | CNH IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [2009/37] | CNH IP Department CNH Belgium NV Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 09152461.1 | 10.02.2009 | [2009/37] | Priority number, date | US20080041310 | 03.03.2008 Original published format: US 41310 | [2009/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2098936 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2098936 | Date: | 31.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, A01B69/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
A01B79/005 (EP,US);
A01B69/007 (EP,US);
G05D1/0293 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur koordinierten Fahrzeugkontrolle mit drahtloser Kommunikation | [2009/37] | English: | Method and system for coordinated vehicle control with wireless communication | [2009/37] | French: | Procédé et système de commande coordonnée de véhicules utilisant une communication sans fil | [2011/19] |
Former [2009/37] | Procédé et système de commande coordonnée de véhicules avec communication sans fil | Examination procedure | 09.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2009 | AT | 31.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | CY | 31.08.2011 | CZ | 31.08.2011 | DK | 31.08.2011 | EE | 31.08.2011 | FI | 31.08.2011 | HR | 31.08.2011 | LT | 31.08.2011 | LV | 31.08.2011 | MK | 31.08.2011 | MT | 31.08.2011 | NL | 31.08.2011 | PL | 31.08.2011 | RO | 31.08.2011 | SE | 31.08.2011 | SI | 31.08.2011 | SK | 31.08.2011 | TR | 31.08.2011 | BG | 30.11.2011 | NO | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.12.2011 | ES | 11.12.2011 | IS | 31.12.2011 | PT | 02.01.2012 | IE | 10.02.2012 | LU | 10.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
LU | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
TR | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
MT | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 30.11.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
ES | 11.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
MK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
IE | 10.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
DK | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
PL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
EE | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
RO | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
SK | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
PT | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/17] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 31.08.2011 | |
CY | 31.08.2011 | ||
FI | 31.08.2011 | ||
HR | 31.08.2011 | ||
LT | 31.08.2011 | ||
LV | 31.08.2011 | ||
NL | 31.08.2011 | ||
SE | 31.08.2011 | ||
SI | 31.08.2011 | ||
NO | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.12.2011 | ||
IS | 31.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0058800 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4 - page 6 *; | [A]EP1219153 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0012] *; | [A]US2002165645 (KAGEYAMA MASATO [JP]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [XA]EP1839479 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [X] 9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0009] - [0011] , [0014] , [0029] - [0035] - [0040] , [0043] * [A] 1-8 | by applicant | WO0058800 | EP1219153 | EP1839479 |